EP3822750 - A TOUCH AND PRESSURE SENSING SYSTEM WITH DIFFERENT UPPER LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensobright Industries, LLC 160 Greentree Dr Ste 101 Dover City, Kent County DE 19904 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUYUKSAHIN, Utku SENSOBRIGHT INDUSTRIES, LLC Kozyatagi Mahallesi, Bayar Caddesi, Degirmen Sokak Sisikler Sit. Blok D.20 Kozyatagi ISTANBUL / TR | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Incorporated Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP Cankaya 06540 Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Incorporated Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP 06540 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 20214947.2 | 27.04.2017 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | TR20160006370 | 13.05.2016 Original published format: TR 201606370 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822750 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3822750 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/042, B25J13/08 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
B25J13/084 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F3/0414 (IL,KR);
G01L1/242 (KR,US);
G01L1/248 (KR,US);
G01L5/228 (KR,US);
G06F3/0416 (KR);
G06F3/042 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGS- UND DRUCKERFASSENDES SYSTEM MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN DECKLAGEN | [2021/20] | English: | A TOUCH AND PRESSURE SENSING SYSTEM WITH DIFFERENT UPPER LAYERS | [2021/20] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR CAPTER LE TOUCHER ET LA PRESSION AVEC DES COUCHES SUPÉRIEURES DIFFÉRENTES | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 18.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17735666.4 / EP3455705 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | IE | 27.04.2023 | LU | 27.04.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 27.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 27.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | HR | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | HR | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | HR | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | HR | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | HR | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 31.08.2022 | |
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 31.08.2022 | |
RS | 31.08.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4547668 (TSIKOS CONSTANTINE [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 18-21,42-50,58 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, lines 31-60 *; | [A]US4816811 (BOGATIN ERIC L [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005029028 (TOUDAI TLO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] - [0071] - [0078] *; | [A]US2012303839 (JACKSON PHILIP [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0054] - [0062] *; | [A]US2015109607 (BUYUKSAHIN UTKU [TR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0033] - [0043]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2015217781 (LEE SEUNG HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0056] - [0057] - [0109] - [0112] - [0119] , [0120] , [0130] , [0131] , [0133] *; | [A] - BUYUKSAHIN UTKU ET AL, "Multi point, high sensitive tactile sensing module for robots and devices", IEEE SENSORS 2014 PROCEEDINGS, IEEE, (20141102), doi:10.1109/ICSENS.2014.6985010, pages 366 - 369, XP032705477 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSENS.2014.6985010 | [A] - LANG P ED - CHERITI A ET AL, "Design and prototyping of a fiber optic tactile array", ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING, 2008. CCECE 2008. CANADIAN CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080504), ISBN 978-1-4244-1642-4, pages 373 - 376, XP031285989 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PETER KAMPMANN ET AL, "Integration of Fiber-Optic Sensor Arrays into a Multi-Modal Tactile Sensor Processing System for Robotic End-Effectors", SENSORS, (20140416), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.3390/s140406854, pages 6854 - 6876, XP055408102 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s140406854 | by applicant | US4547668 | WO2005029028 | US2010155579 | WO2014011126 |