EP3866542 - HIGH PERFORMANCE NLOS WIRELESS BACKHAUL FRAME STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTRAND, Pierre Le Hameau Des Roses 1261 Chemin De Fontmerie 06600 Antibes / FR | 02 /
ROH, June Chul 944 Falcon Drive Allen, TX 75013 / US | 03 /
YAO, Jun 602-No 42-Iane 1203 Changdao Road Pudong, Shanghai 200129 / CN | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 20215067.8 | 22.01.2016 | [2021/33] | Priority number, date | US201562106587P | 22.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562106587 P | US201514753099 | 29.06.2015 Original published format: US201514753099 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866542 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, // H04L5/00, H04B7/155, H04L1/00 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,CN);
H04L5/00 (US);
H04B7/15542 (EP,CN);
H04L1/0065 (EP,CN);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2021/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STRUKTUR FÜR HOCHLEISTUNGSFÄHIGEN DRAHTLOSEN NLOS-BACKHAULRAHMEN | [2021/33] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE NLOS WIRELESS BACKHAUL FRAME STRUCTURE | [2021/33] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TRAME DE LIAISON SANS FIL NLOS DE PERFORMANCE ÉLEVÉE | [2021/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 18.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16740865.7 / EP3248424 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010122419 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 2, 7-9, 11 * * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, line 2 - page 7, line 2 * * page 10, lines 2-11 * * page 11, lines 10-16 * * page 13, lines 24-35 * * page 14, lines 13-25, 32-34 * * page 15, line 28 - page 17, line 21 * * page 17, line 29 - page 20, line 8 * * claims 1-28 *; | [I]US2014071954 (AU KELVIN KAR KIN [CA], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 3-7, 9-11 * * paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0031] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0 35] *; | [E]WO2016118928 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-5 *; | [E]WO2016118927 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] ** figures 1-4 * |