EP3838059 - PORTABLE ERGONOMIC HAIR-STYLING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIENAY, Arnaud 18 rue Roger Salengro 69009 Lyon / FR | 02 /
FUIN, Matthieu 35 allée du Levant 69570 Dardilly / FR | 03 /
DELHOM, Jérémy 11 rue Lebrun 69004 Lyon / FR | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | SEB Développement Direction Propriété industrielle - Brevets 112, chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB - CS 90229 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 20215288.0 | 18.12.2020 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | FR20190014796 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1914796 | [2021/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838059 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3838059 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A45D20/10, A45D20/50, A45D20/12 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
A45D20/10 (EP,CN);
A45D20/12 (EP,CN);
A45D20/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERGONOMISCHES TRAGBARES FRISIERGERÄT | [2021/25] | English: | PORTABLE ERGONOMIC HAIR-STYLING APPLIANCE | [2021/25] | French: | APPAREIL DE COIFFURE PORTATIF ERGONOMIQUE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4196343 (HAN PAUL S [US]); | [Y]CN2798684Y (MASTER & DICKSON SERVICE CO LT [IT]); | [Y]CN201328477Y (HONGYUN QUAN [CN]); | [Y]US9596916 (MOLONEY PATRICK JOSEPH WILLIAM [GB], et al); | [XY]CN110464102 (DREAME TECH TIANJIN CO LTD) | Examination | CN110477572 |