EP3812749 - APPARATUS AND METHODS OF INSPECTING A WIRE SEGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tillotson, Brian J. c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
Higgins, Robert P. c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | 03 /
Savol, Andrej Martin c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chciago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 20215334.2 | 04.04.2016 | [2021/17] | Priority number, date | US201514680293 | 07.04.2015 Original published format: US201514680293 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812749 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3812749 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/952 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
G01N21/952 (EP,US);
G01N21/8806 (US);
G01N21/8803 (US);
G06T7/0004 (US);
G01N21/88 (US);
G01N2201/068 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION EINES DRAHTSEGMENTS | [2021/17] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS OF INSPECTING A WIRE SEGMENT | [2021/17] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS D'INSPECTION D'UN SEGMENT DE FIL | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16163687.3 / EP3078960 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US4358202 (PUFFER LEROY G, et al); | [IA]US5936725 (PIKE JOHN NAZARIAN [US], et al); | [IA]US6842258 (LEINVUO JONI [FI], et al) |