EP3882827 - MULTI-RESOURCE AND AUTONOMOUS HIERARCHICAL BROKERING PLATFORM TO ENABLE SLICE RESOURCE EXCHANGE AMONG HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK TENANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Laboratories Europe GmbH Kurfürsten-Anlage 36 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sciancalepore, Vincenzo Kaiserstraße 67 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Zanzi, Lanfranco Römerstraße 18 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Albanese, Antonio NEC Laboratories Europe GmbH Kurfürsten-Anlage 36 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
Costa-Pérez, Xavier Dossenheimer Landstraße 93 69121 Heidelberg / DE | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 20215638.6 | 18.12.2020 | [2021/38] | Priority number, date | US202016819218 | 16.03.2020 Original published format: US202016819218 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882827 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP);
H04L47/783 (US);
H04L47/745 (US);
H04L47/788 (US);
H04L9/0643 (US);
H04L9/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTI-RESOURCE UND AUTONOME HIERARCHISCHE BROKERING-PLATTFORM, UM DEN SCHEIBENRESSOURCEN-AUSTAUSCH UNTER HETEROGENEN NETZWERK-MIETERN ZU ERMÖGLICHEN | [2021/38] | English: | MULTI-RESOURCE AND AUTONOMOUS HIERARCHICAL BROKERING PLATFORM TO ENABLE SLICE RESOURCE EXCHANGE AMONG HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK TENANTS | [2021/38] | French: | PLATEFORME DE COURTAGE HIÉRARCHIQUE MULTI-RESSOURCES ET AUTONOME POUR PERMETTRE L'ÉCHANGE DE RESSOURCES SLICE ENTRE LES LOCATAIRES HÉTÉROGÈNES DU RÉSEAU | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 28.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2019152750 (SALESFORCE COM INC [US]) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0385]; figures 1-26; claims 1-2 * | by applicant | WO2017140356 | - D. B. RAWATA. ALSHAIKHI, "Leveraging Distributed Blockchain-based Scheme for Wireless Network Virtualization with Security and QoS Constraints", International Conference on Computing, Networking and Communications (ICNC, (20180300), doi:10.1109/ICCNC.2018.8390344, pages 332 - 336, XP033361088 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCNC.2018.8390344 | - B. NOURA. KSENTININ. HERBAUTP. A. FRANGOUDISH. MOUNGLA, "A Blockchain-Based Network Slice Broker for 5G Services", IEEE Networking Letters, (20190900), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:10.1109/LNET.2019.2915117, pages 99 - 102, XP011741852 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LNET.2019.2915117 | - W. LIA. SFORZINS. FEDOROVG. O. KARAME, "Towards Scalable and Private Industrial Blockchains", Proceedings of the ACM Workshop on Blockchain, Cryptocurrencies and Contracts (BCC, (20170400), doi:10.1145/3055518.3055531, pages 9 - 14, XP055397747 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3055518.3055531 |