EP3854325 - SYSTEM FOR DRIVING AN ULTRASONIC HANDPIECE AS A FUNCTION OF THE MECHANICAL IMPEDANCE OF THE HANDPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker Corporation 2825 Airview Boulevard Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWNEY, Adam 6618 Annandale Drive Kalamazoo, MI Michigan 49009 / US | 02 /
OWEN, Matthew 11434 S. 32nd Street Vicksbury, MI Michigan 49097 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20215677.4 | 07.08.2014 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | US201361863152P | 07.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361863152 P | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854325 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/320068 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/142 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00977 (US);
A61B2017/320069 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/32007 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00648 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0072 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00732 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2021/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES ULTRASCHALLHANDWERKZEUGS ALS FUNKTION DER MECHANISCHEN IMPEDANZ DES HANDWERKZEUGS | [2021/30] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DRIVING AN ULTRASONIC HANDPIECE AS A FUNCTION OF THE MECHANICAL IMPEDANCE OF THE HANDPIECE | [2021/30] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR COMMANDER UNE PIÈCE À MAIN À ULTRASONS EN FONCTION DE L'IMPÉDANCE MÉCANIQUE DE LA PIÈCE À MAIN | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 27.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14752992.9 / EP3030166 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1518505 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [Y] 2-6,8,11-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0066] * * paragraphs [0072] - [0073] * [A] 7,9,10; | [A]US2010125292 (WIENER EITAN T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0021] ** paragraphs [0025] - [0027] *; | [XAY]US2012078139 (ALDRIDGE JEFFREY L [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0106] - [0109] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraphs [0129] - [0139]; figures 9-10 * * paragraph [0143] * * paragraphs [0158] - [0178]; figures 13A-B * [A] 7,9,10 [Y] 2-6,8,11-15 |