EP3812317 - DEVICE FOR GUIDING AND PIVOTING BODIES, INSTALLATION AND TREATMENT LINES FOR PET CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILGENSTEIN, Torsten Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
MEIER, Matthias Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 03 /
HUETTNER, Johann Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 04 /
FIEGLER, Rudolf Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 05 /
ORTNER, Reinhard Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 06 /
SEIDEL, Ulrich Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 07 /
GADOMSKI, Hendrik Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 20216090.9 | 08.12.2016 | [2021/17] | Priority number, date | DE201610200908 | 22.01.2016 Original published format: DE102016200908 | [2021/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812317 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/248, B29C49/42, // B65G11/06 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
B65G11/063 (EP,US);
B29C49/4205 (EP,US);
B29C49/42097 (EP);
B65G47/248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜHREN UND VERSCHWENKEN VON KÖRPERN, ANLAGE UND BEHANDLUNGSLINIEN FÜR PET-BEHÄLTER | [2021/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR GUIDING AND PIVOTING BODIES, INSTALLATION AND TREATMENT LINES FOR PET CONTAINERS | [2021/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR GUIDER ET FAIRE PIVOTER DES CORPS, INSTALLATION ET LIGNES DE TRAITEMENT POUR RÉCIPIENTS EN PET | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 22.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.04.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16809769.9 / EP3405416 | Divisional application(s) | EP23167899.6 / EP4223673 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 15.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.03.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL7003812 (BLOM & MATERS MASCHF) [A] 1-16* figures 1-2 *; | [XI]US4343575 (KIMBALL PAUL A) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [I] 4-7,11-16; | [X]US4479574 (JULIUS RICHARD F [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5609237 (LENHART RONALD A [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XI]DE202008002349U (RUDOLF HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [I] 4-7,11-16; | [X]FR2930241 (SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XI]DE202013007104U (DIETZ & ROLLWA AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-11 * [I] 4-7,11-16 | by applicant | DE2301524 | EP0070195 | US4479574 | DE202011005686U |