EP4019813 - THROTTLE ARRANGEMENT FOR PISTON COMPRESSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burckhardt Compression AG Franz-Burckhardt-Strasse 5 8404 Winterthur / CH | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feistel, Norbert 8548 Ellikon a.d. Thur / CH | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20217155.9 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019813 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4019813 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/44, F16J15/56, F04B39/04, F16J15/26, F04B39/00 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
F16J15/441 (EP,KR);
F04B39/042 (EP,KR);
F04B53/02 (US);
F04B39/0005 (EP,KR);
F04B39/041 (EP);
F16J15/26 (EP,KR);
F16J15/56 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | F16J15/00, F16J15/44, F16J15/56, F04B39/04, F16J15/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DROSSELANORDNUNG FÜR KOLBENKOMPRESSOREN | [2022/26] | English: | THROTTLE ARRANGEMENT FOR PISTON COMPRESSORS | [2022/26] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ÉTRANGLEMENT POUR COMPRESSEURS À PISTON | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2022/26] | 23.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 23.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 18.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 18.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | MC | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | IT | 23.12.2023 | LU | 23.12.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SK | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
IT | 23.12.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 15.11.2023 | |
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1799335 (WADDELL GASPER L) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 50 - line 91; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]CH439897 (LINDE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15* column 4, line 17 - line 44; figure 1 *; | [A]US3469855 (ENTING JANNES) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 1; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US4289322 (TRAVERSARI ALESSANDRO, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 9 - line 45; figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | CH439897 |