EP3850993 - LOCKING MECHANISM FOR A PRODUCT-DISPENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fasteners for Retail, Inc. 8181 Darrow Road Twinsburg, OH 44087 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUA, Yun 10311 Wildflower Way Broadview Heights, Ohio 44147 / US | 02 /
LIEDTKE, Michael Eric 526 Pioneer Avenue Kent, Ohio 44240 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20217173.2 | 23.12.2020 | [2021/29] | Priority number, date | US202016743687 | 15.01.2020 Original published format: US202016743687 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850993 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16D63/00 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
A47F5/0861 (EP);
G07F5/26 (US);
A47F5/0823 (EP);
F16D11/16 (US);
F16D63/006 (EP);
F16H21/44 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | A47F5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] |
Former [2021/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2024/32] | English: | LOCKING MECHANISM FOR A PRODUCT-DISPENSING DEVICE | [2021/29] | French: | MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE | [2024/32] |
Former [2021/29] | VERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS FÜR EINE PRODUKTANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2021/29] | MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE POUR DISPOSITIF DE PRÉSENTATION DE PRODUITS | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 13.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6027148 (SHOEMAKER RODNEY [US]); | [X]WO2006123220 (ITW IND COMPONENTS SRL [IT], et al); | [A]US2017238724 (BERGLUND DAVID N [US], et al) |