EP4020853 - A DISTRIBUTED RADIOHEAD SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Avishay 4931945 Petach Tikva / IL | 02 /
BAREL, Hagay 2703821 Kiriat Bialik Z / IL | 03 /
RESHEF, Ehud 36551 Qiryat Tivon / IL | 04 /
MANN, Eytan 71727 Modiin M / IL | 05 /
KLEIN, Ofir Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 06 /
SUTSKOVER, Ilan 3837610 Hadera M / IL | 07 /
GINSBURG, Noam Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 08 /
BANIN, Elan 43606 Raanana M / IL | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20217199.7 | 24.12.2020 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020853 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/318, H04B1/10, H04W52/02, H04W88/08 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (CN);
H04W52/0203 (US);
H04B1/1027 (EP);
H04B7/0413 (CN);
H04L27/0002 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTEILTES FUNKKOPFSYSTEM | [2022/26] | English: | A DISTRIBUTED RADIOHEAD SYSTEM | [2022/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CASQUE AUDIO DISTRIBUÉ | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 29.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2838294 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]); | [X]US2017214567 (SALKINTZIS APOSTOLIS K [GR], et al); | [X]EP3264674 (INTEL CORP [US]) |