EP3913054 - ATP-BINDING CASSETTE FAMILY CODING POLYRIBONUCLEOTIDES AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethris GmbH Semmelweisstrasse 3 82152 Planegg / DE | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLANK, Christian 82234 Wessling / DE | 02 /
RUDOLPH, Carsten 82152 Krailing / DE | 03 /
ANEJA, Manish Kumar 81373 Munich / DE | 04 /
WEISS, Ludwig 86438 Kissing / DE | 05 /
FERIZI, Mehrije 81539 Munich / DE | 06 /
GEIGER, Johannes 81249 Munich / DE | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20217397.7 | 30.06.2016 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | EP20150174677 | 30.06.2015 Original published format: EP 15174677 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3913054 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, A61P27/00, A61P9/00, A61P3/10, A61P1/16, A61P11/00, A61P25/00, A61K38/16 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
A61K38/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61K48/0066 (GB,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
A61K38/1709 (GB);
A61K48/0083 (US);
A61P1/16 (EP,GB);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP,GB);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP,GB);
A61P27/00 (EP,GB);
A61P27/02 (EP,KR);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP,GB);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP,GB);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/47 (GB);
C07K14/4705 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (US);
A61K9/1271 (US);
A61K9/51 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | FÜR ATP-BINDUNGSKASSETTENFAMILIE CODIERENDE POLYRIBONUKLEOTIDE UND FORMULIERUNGEN DAVON | [2021/47] | English: | ATP-BINDING CASSETTE FAMILY CODING POLYRIBONUCLEOTIDES AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF | [2021/47] | French: | POLYRIBONUCLÉOTIDES CODANT POUR UNE FAMILLE DE CASSETTES DE LIAISON À L'ATP ET FORMULATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16742172.6 / EP3317411 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO2011012316 | US8450298 | WO2013185069 | WO2014153052 | WO2014207231 | EP3034539 | - WOLFF et al., Science, (19900000), vol. 247, pages 1465 - 1468 | - AKINC et al., Mol Ther, (20090000), vol. 17, pages 872 - 9 | - PFEIFER et al., Ther. Deliv., (20100000), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 133 - 48 | - AKINC et al., Nat Biotech, (20070000), vol. 26, pages 561 - 569 | - LOVE et al., PNAS, (20100000), vol. 107, pages 1864 - 9 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NM_001089.2 |