EP4023144 - NIRS DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIRx Medizintechnik GmbH Gustav-Meyer-Allee 25 13355 Berlin / DE | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von LÜHMANN, Alexander 13355 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BRITZ, Patrick Gustav-Meyer-Allee 25 13355 Berlin / DE | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20217768.9 | 30.12.2020 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023144 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/1455 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A61B5/0075 (EP);
A61B5/1455 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIRS-VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2022/27] | English: | NIRS DEVICE AND METHOD | [2022/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE NIRS | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009299675 (ISAACSON PHILIP O [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011092824 (VEEN JEROEN [NL], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2019183364 (BASU AMAR S [US]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] ** figures 1-19 *; | [X] - PINTI PAOLA ET AL, "A Review on the Use of Wearable Functional Near-Infrared Spectroscopy in Naturalistic Environments : Review of fNIRS measurements in naturalistic environments", JAPANESE PSYCHOLOGICAL RESEARCH, vol. 60, no. 4, doi:10.1111/jpr.12206, ISSN 0021-5368, (20180719), pages 347 - 373, URL: https://api.wiley.com/onlinelibrary/tdm/v1/articles/10.1111%2Fjpr.12206, XP055805137 [X] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jpr.12206 | by applicant | - SCHOLKMANN et al., "A review on continuous wave functional near-infrared spectroscopy and imaging instrumentation and methodology", Neurolmage, (20140000), vol. 85, doi:10.1016/j.neuroimage.2013.05.004, pages 6 - 27, XP028797489 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroimage.2013.05.004 | - SHERKAT et al., "SHADE: Absorption spectroscopy enhancement with ambient light estimation and narrow band detection", Optik, (20200000), vol. 220, page 165116 |