EP3846047 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING RELEVANT VARIABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL SAS Rue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/27] | For all designated states BULL SAS Rue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes sous Bois / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SGHIOUER, Kaoutar 2 bis Avenue de Verdun 60200 Compiègne / FR | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 20218022.0 | 31.12.2020 | [2021/27] | Priority number, date | FR20190015809 | 31.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1915809 | [2021/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3846047 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/215 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
G06F16/215 (EP);
G06N3/126 (US);
G05B23/0283 (US);
G06F17/15 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06Q30/0248 (US);
H04L63/1416 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] |
Former [2021/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG RELEVANTER VARIABLEN | [2021/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING RELEVANT VARIABLES | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION DE VARIABLES PERTINENTES | [2021/27] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 07.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005114369 (GOULD JOEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] *; | [I] - ABEDJAN ZIAWASCH ET AL, "Profiling relational data: a survey", VLDB JOURNAL, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, vol. 24, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S00778-015-0389-Y, ISSN 1066-8888, (20150602), pages 557 - 581, (20150602), XP035514145 [I] 1-15 * page 558, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 565, column r, paragraph 4 - page 566, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00778-015-0389-y | [A] - CHIANG R H L ET AL, "Linear correlation discovery in databases: a data mining approach", DATA & KNOWLEDGE ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 53, no. 3, ISSN 0169-023X, (20041019), pages 311 - 337, (20050601), XP027783932 [A] 1-15 * page 313 - page 314 * | by applicant | - "Consistency-based search in feature selection", DASHLIU, Artificial Intelligence, Elsevier, (20031200), vol. 151, pages 155 - 176 |