EP3690457 - APPARATUS FOR MONITORING SURGE PROTECTION DEVICE AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 Rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiaodong Building 9, No. 3000, LongDong Avenue Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
MA, Feng Building 9, No. 3000, LongDong Avenue Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 20305065.3 | 27.01.2020 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | CN20191094085 | 30.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910094085 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3690457 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/00, H02H9/04, // H02H7/00 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H02H9/042 (EP);
H02H1/0038 (CN);
G01R31/3277 (EP);
G01R19/04 (EP);
G01R31/52 (EP);
H02H7/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER ÜBERSPANNUNGSSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE DAVON | [2020/32] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MONITORING SURGE PROTECTION DEVICE AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING THE SAME | [2020/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DE DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURTENSIONS ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 07.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN207232292U (CHENGDU ZHILI ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [X] 1-10,13-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN106451399 (SICHUAN ZHONGGUANG LIGHTNING PROT TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,9,10,12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 11 |