EP3862796 - REAL-TIME RECONFIGURATION OF PHASED ARRAY OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUEDES, Orland Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | 02 /
LEMARENKO, Mikhail Schlumberger BGC, 9F, Block A, Innovation Plaza Tsinghua Science Park Haidian District 100084 - Beijing / CN | 03 /
HORI, Hiroshi Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | 04 /
COZON, Jean-Baptiste Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | 05 /
OTERO ROLDAN, Beatriz Eugenia Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | 06 /
FRADIN, Nicolas Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | 07 /
VAN OS, Roel Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | 08 /
KALYANRAMAN, Ram Sunder 1325 S. Dairy Ashford Houston, Texas 77077 / US | [2024/22] |
Former [2021/32] | 01 /
GUEDES, Orland Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | ||
02 /
LEMARENKO, Mikhail Schlumberger BGC, 9F, Block A, Innovation Plaza Tsinghua Science Park Haidian District 100084 - Beijing / CN | |||
03 /
HORI, Hiroshi Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | |||
04 /
COZON, Jean-Baptiste Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | |||
05 /
OTERO ROLDAN, Beatriz Eugenia Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | |||
06 /
FRADIN, Nicolas Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | |||
07 /
VAN OS, Roel Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1 rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | |||
08 /
KALYANRAMAN, Ram Sunder 1325 S. Dairy Ashford, Houston Texas 77077 / US | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 20305113.1 | 06.02.2020 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3862796 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3862796 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/50, E21B47/002, E21B47/005 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
G01V1/50 (EP,US);
E21B47/0025 (EP,US);
E21B47/005 (EP,US);
E21B47/006 (US);
E21B47/085 (US);
E21B47/107 (US);
E21B47/14 (US);
E21B49/00 (US);
G01B17/02 (US);
G01N29/04 (US);
G01N29/2437 (US);
G01N33/383 (US);
G01S15/8945 (US);
G01N2291/0232 (US);
G01N2291/0289 (US);
G01N2291/044 (US);
G01N2291/106 (US);
G01V2210/1299 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | G01V1/50, // E21B47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] |
Former [2021/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ECHTZEITREKONFIGURATION PHASENGESTEUERTER ARRAY-OPERATIONEN | [2021/32] | English: | REAL-TIME RECONFIGURATION OF PHASED ARRAY OPERATION | [2021/32] | French: | RECONFIGURATION EN TEMPS RÉEL D'OPÉRATION DE RÉSEAU À COMMANDE DE PHASE | [2021/32] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 14.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees FR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 14.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.02.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 14.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.02.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.02.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1348954 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR]); | [XY]US2016216393 (ZHOU QUMING [US], et al); | [A]US2017090057 (THIERRY SYLVAIN [FR], et al) | by applicant | US3524162 | US4594691 | US6614716 | US7149146 | US7675813 | US9534487 | US9625599 | US10114138 | US10126454 | US10364664 |