EP3912628 - NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUES TO INHIBIT THE MAIN PROTEASE OF A CORONAVIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Change - inventor | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut de Recherche en Semiochimie et Ethologie Appliquée Quartier Salignan 84400 Apt / FR | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAGEAT, Patrick 84400 APT / FR | [2023/43] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
PAGEAT, Patrick 84400 APT / FR | ||
02 /
LORMIER, Anh Tuan 13800 ISTRES / FR | Representative(s) | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. C/o Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS 92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. c/o Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20305537.1 | 20.05.2020 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912628 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/706, A61K31/7076 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/706 (EP,US);
A61K31/7056 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P31/14 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7056, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/706, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUKLEOSIDANALOGA ZUR HEMMUNG DER HAUPTPROTEASE EINES CORONAVIRUS | [2021/47] | English: | NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUES TO INHIBIT THE MAIN PROTEASE OF A CORONAVIRUS | [2021/47] | French: | ANALOGUES DE NUCLÉOSIDE POUR INHIBER LA PROTÉASE PRINCIPALE D'UN CORONAVIRUS | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 20.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005020884 (IDENIX CAYMAN LTD, et al) [A] 1-9* claim 1; compounds A-N *; | [A]WO2006042478 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] *; | [A]US2006142383 (SHEN JIANHUA [CN], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0010] , [0036]; claims 4,5 *; | [A] - SUN JIAN-GUO ET AL, "Clitocine potentiates TRAIL-mediated apoptosis in human colon cancer cells by promoting Mcl-1 degradation", APOPTOSIS, LONDON, GB, vol. 21, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S10495-016-1273-Y, ISSN 1360-8185, (20160715), pages 1144 - 1157, (20160715), XP036040918 [A] 1-9 * See Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10495-016-1273-y | by applicant | KR20060102602 | EP3067053 | - GORDON D.E. et al., "Structure of M pro from COVID-19 virus and discovery of its inhibitors", Nature, (20200000), pages 1 - 5 | - CHAN J.F. W et al., Emerg. Microbes Infect., (20200000), vol. 9, pages 221 - 236 | - FEHRA.R.PERLMAN, Methods. Mol. Biol., (20150000), vol. 1282, pages 1 - 23 | - ELLIS, J., The Canadian veterinary journal, (20190000), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 147 - 152 | - T. MURAMATSU et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20160000), vol. 113, pages 12997 - 13002 | - KUBO et al., Tet. Lett., (19860000), vol. 27, page 4277 | - SUN et al., Apoptosis, (20140000), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 871 - 882 | - VAZ et al., Food and Chemical Toxicology, (20100000), vol. 48, no. 10, pages 2881 - 2884 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 105798-74-1 | - MOSS R.J. et al., J Med Chem, (19880000), vol. 31, pages 786 - 790 | - BIKADIHAZAI, J. Cheminform., (20090000), vol. 1, page 15 | - MORRIS, G. M. et al., J. Comput. Chem., (19980000), vol. 19, no. 14, pages 1639 - 1662 | - SOLIS, F. J.WETS, R. J. B., Math. Oper. Res., (19810000), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 19 - 30 | - TON et al., Molecular Informatics, (20200000), pages 1 - 8 | - TON et al., Molecular Informatics, 2020, (20200000), pages 1 - 8 | - WANG et al., Journal of virology, (20160000), vol. 90, no. 4, pages 1910 - 1917 | - THEERAWATANASIRIKUL, S. et al., Antiviral Research, (20200000), vol. 174, page 104697 | - JACOBS et al., Journal of medicinal chemistry, (20130000), vol. 56, no. 2, pages 534 - 546 | - ZHANG et al., Science, (20200000), vol. 368, no. 6489, pages 409 - 412 | - YANG, H. et al., PLoS biology, (20050000), vol. 3, no. 10, page GC376 | - YE, G. et al., Viruses, (20200000), vol. 12, no. 2, page 240 | - ZENG, Q. et al., PNAS, (20080000), vol. 105, no. 26, pages 9065 - 9069 |