EP3939514 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A HEALTH CONDITION OF THE LIVER OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Echosens 6 Rue Ferrus 75014 Paris / FR | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDRIN, Laurent 75014 PARIS / FR | 02 /
MIETTE, Véronique 75014 PARIS / FR | 03 /
DESTRO, Marie 75014 PARIS / FR | 04 /
KAHATT, Espir CARLSBAD, CA 92011 / US | 05 /
WILLIAMS, Michael CARLSBAD, CA 92011 / US | 06 /
KOSTELESKI, Adrian MOORESTOWN, NJ 08057 / US | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20305804.5 | 15.07.2020 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939514 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, G01N33/49, G16H50/30, A61B5/00, A61B5/151, A61B5/157 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A61B8/485 (EP);
A61B5/0051 (EP);
A61B5/150022 (EP);
A61B5/150358 (EP);
A61B5/150854 (EP);
A61B5/150862 (EP);
A61B5/15087 (EP);
A61B5/157 (EP);
A61B5/4244 (EP);
A61B8/5223 (EP);
G01N33/49 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] |
Former [2022/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES GESUNDHEITSZUSTANDS DER LEBER EINES PATIENTEN | [2022/03] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A HEALTH CONDITION OF THE LIVER OF A SUBJECT | [2022/03] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UN ÉTAT DE SANTÉ DU FOIE D'UN SUJET | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2018140247 (MIETTE VÉRONIQUE [FR], et al) [Y] 1,4,8-17 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5-7,18-21; | [Y]WO2015014763 (ECHOSENS [FR]) [Y] 1,4,8-17 * page 7 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 15 - page 16 *; | [Y]KR20180003061 (MA SEON YOUNG [CA]) [Y] 1,4,8-15,17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2600266 (BIOPREDICTIVE [FR], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | [Y] - DA BEN L ET AL, "The Delta-4 fibrosis score (D4FS): A novel fibrosis score in chronic hepatitis D", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 174, doi:10.1016/J.ANTIVIRAL.2019.104691, ISSN 0166-3542, (20191216), (20191216), XP086051223 [Y] 16 * see the D4FS fibrosis score in section 3.3 on p. 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.antiviral.2019.104691 | [A] - FRAQUELLI M ET AL, "A SEQUENTIAL PREDICTIVE ALGORITHM COMBINING APRI AND TRANSIENT ELASTOGRAPHY (TE) FOR DIAGNOSING LIVER FIBROSIS IN CHRONIC HEPATITIS C", DIGESTIVE AND LIVER DISEASE, W.B. SAUNDERS, GB, vol. 41, doi:10.1016/S1590-8658(09)60079-7, ISSN 1590-8658, (20090301), page S31, (20090301), XP026191117 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1590-8658(09)60079-7 | by applicant | - L. SANDRIN, "Transient elastography: a new noninvasive method for assessment of hepatic fibrosis", Ultrasound in Medicine and Biology, (20030000), vol. 29, no. 12, doi:10.1016/j.ultrasmedbio.2003.07.001, XP004482538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultrasmedbio.2003.07.001 | - S. MULLERL. SANDRIN, "Liver stiffness: a novel parameter for the diagnosis of liver disease", Hepatic Medicine: Evidence and Research, (20100000), vol. 2, pages 49 - 67 | - P. NEWSOME, "FibroScan-AST (FAST) score for the non-invasive identification of patients with non-alcoholic steatohepatitis with significant activity and fibrosis: a prospective derivation and global validation study", The Lancet, Gastroenterology and Hepatology, (20200401), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 362 - 373 | - STERLING R. K. et al., "Development of a simple noninvasive index to predict significant fibrosis patients with HIV/HCV co-infection", Hepatology, (20060000), vol. 43, doi:10.1002/hep.21178, pages 1317 - 1325, XP002563342 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.21178 |