EP3972126 - BIDIRECTIONAL SWITCH FOR POWER CONTROL IN A DAISY CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 Rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2024/44] |
Former [2022/12] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 Rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLINA MENDOZA, Gregory 16600 Ruelle-sur-Touvre / FR | 02 /
CASTILLO BUENAVENTURA, Felipe 16000 Angoulême / FR | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Schneider Electric Service Propriété Industrielle 35, rue Joseph Monier CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2024/44] |
Former [2022/12] | Mouney, Jérôme Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier - CS30323 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20306049.6 | 18.09.2020 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3972126 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3972126 | Date: | 30.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02, H03F3/34, H03K17/66, H03K17/68 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H03F3/34 (EP);
H03K17/60 (CN,US);
H03F1/0283 (EP);
H03K17/663 (EP);
H03K17/68 (EP);
H03K2217/0009 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALER SCHALTER FÜR LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG IN EINER DAISY CHAIN KONFIGURATION | [2024/30] | English: | BIDIRECTIONAL SWITCH FOR POWER CONTROL IN A DAISY CHAIN | [2022/12] | French: | INTERRUPTEUR BIDIRECTIONNEL POUR LE CONTRÔLE DE LA PUISSANCE DANS UNE CONFIGURATION DAISY CHAIN | [2024/35] |
Former [2022/12] | BIDIREKTIONALER SCHALTER ZUR LEISTUNGSREGELUNG IN EINER DAISY-CHAIN | ||
Former [2022/12] | COMMUTATEUR BIDIRECTIONNEL POUR LE RÉGLAGE DE LA PUISSANCE DANS UNE GUIRLANDE | Examination procedure | 19.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 19.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5121416 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]US5237211 (TANAKA MINORU [JP], et al); | [A]US5832305 (BRIGGS BARRY D [US], et al); | [IA]US2003112053 (REBER ROLF [DE], et al); | [A]DE102006003157 (INSTA ELEKTRO GMBH [DE]); | [A]JP2016062790 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) |