EP3971776 - MEDICAL CONTAINER COMPRISING AN RFID TAG FOR REMOTE IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson France rue Aristide Bergès 38800 Le Pont-de-Claix / FR | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIVIER, Cédric 38340 VOREPPE / FR | 02 /
EUVRARD, Nicolas NC 27701 / US | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20306050.4 | 18.09.2020 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971776 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, A61M5/00, G06M1/00, G16H20/17 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G06K19/077 (EP);
G06K19/0723 (KR);
G06K19/07758 (US);
A61M5/001 (EP);
A61M5/3129 (EP,KR);
G06K19/07749 (KR);
G06K19/0776 (KR);
G06K19/07773 (KR,US);
G06K7/00 (EP);
G16H20/17 (EP,KR);
G16H40/63 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/583 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/6054 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHER BEHÄLTER MIT RFID-ETIKETT ZUR FERNIDENTIFIZIERUNG DES MEDIZINISCHEN BEHÄLTERS | [2022/12] | English: | MEDICAL CONTAINER COMPRISING AN RFID TAG FOR REMOTE IDENTIFICATION | [2022/12] | French: | RÉCIPIENT MÉDICAL COMPRENANT UNE ÉTIQUETTE RFID POUR L'IDENTIFICATION À DISTANCE DUDIT RÉCIPIENT MÉDICAL | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 22.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006186204 (LUBOW ALLEN [US]); | [Y]US2006232413 (LAM FOR S [US], et al); | [Y]US2017124264 (JORDAN CRAIG [US], et al); | [Y]US2018093042 (KLEMM THOMAS [DE], et al); | [XY]WO2019189451 (TERUMO CORP [JP]); | [E]US2021008275 (OKUDA YUJI [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2017157784 |