EP3982559 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTIMATING THE LOCATION AND POWER LOSS OF ANOMALIES ALONG AN OPTICAL LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | For all designated states Telecom Paris Tech 19 place Marguerite Perey 91120 Palaiseau / FR | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAY, Alix 91440 BURES SUR YVETTE / FR | 02 /
RAMANTANIS, Petros 92160 ANTONY / FR | 03 /
BOITIER, Fabien 75006 PARIS / FR | 04 /
AWWAD, Elie 92160 ANTONY / FR | 05 /
LONARDI, Matteo 91400 ORSAY / FR | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20306188.2 | 09.10.2020 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982559 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/077, G01M11/00 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G01M11/33 (EP);
H04B10/071 (EP);
H04B10/0771 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER STELLEN UND VERLUSTLEISTUNG VON ANOMALIEN ENTLANG EINER OPTISCHEN VERBINDUNG | [2022/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTIMATING THE LOCATION AND POWER LOSS OF ANOMALIES ALONG AN OPTICAL LINK | [2022/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ESTIMATION DE L'EMPLACEMENT ET DE LA PERTE DE PUISSANCE D'ANOMALIES LE LONG D'UNE LIAISON OPTIQUE | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 12.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5859695 (NELSON LARRY A [US], et al); | [A]US2007071450 (SCHATZ PAUL [US], et al); | [A]US2014133845 (DAHLFORT STEFAN [US], et al) |