EP3978379 - SYSTEM FOR STORING AND TRANSPORTING PRODUCTS IN CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Worldproof Iberia, S.L. La Plaza, 14 33550 Cangas de Onis (Asturias) / ES | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARIA MUÑIZ, Alfredo 33550 Cangas de Onis (Asturias) / ES | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20382865.2 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/14] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978379 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D3/06, B65D5/00, B65D5/42, B65D5/46, B65D21/02, B65D77/16 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
B65D3/06 (EP);
B65D21/0201 (EP);
B65D5/008 (EP);
B65D5/4208 (EP);
B65D5/46008 (EP);
B65D77/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM LAGERN UND TRANSPORTIEREN VON PRODUKTEN IN BEHÄLTERN | [2022/14] | English: | SYSTEM FOR STORING AND TRANSPORTING PRODUCTS IN CONTAINERS | [2022/14] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR LE STOCKAGE ET LE TRANSPORT DE PRODUITS DANS DES RÉCIPIENTS | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1432718 (ARLINGTON MOORE) [A] 1-13 * sentence 69 - sentence 78; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB502266 (KENNETH BERTRAM JAMES BLAKEMOR) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 74 - line 113; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2363148 (ROSEN SAMUEL S) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 42; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US2935238 (ERIC KOEHLER KARL) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 46 - line 63 *; | [XI]WO2006057511 (LEE JEONG-MIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-6,12 * page 4, line 2 - line 20; figures 7-12 * [I] 11,13; | [A]US2015201781 (JIA PENGFEI [CN]) [A] 11* paragraph [0014]; figures 1-2 * |