EP4023204 - A KIT OF PARTS FOR DENTAL RESTORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stick Tech OY P.O. Box 114 20521 Turku / FI | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASSILA, Lippo 21630 Lielax / FI | 02 /
GAROUSHI, Sufyan 20540 Turku / FI | 03 /
VALLITTU, Pekka 21620 Kuusisto / FI | 04 /
SÄILYNOJA, Eija 20660 Littoinen / FI | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20397518.0 | 30.12.2020 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023204 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/75, A61K6/816, A61K6/871, A61K6/873, A61K6/887, C08L33/10, A61K6/40, A61K6/824, A61K6/838 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A61K6/77 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (US);
A61K6/40 (EP);
A61K6/75 (EP,US);
A61K6/816 (EP);
A61K6/824 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILESATZ ZUR ZAHNRESTAURATION | [2022/27] | English: | A KIT OF PARTS FOR DENTAL RESTORATION | [2022/27] | French: | KIT DE PIÈCES POUR LA RESTAURATION DENTAIRE | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010086618 (PASHLEY DAVID HENRY [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0017] , [0045] , [0154] - [0167]; figures 3a,3b; example 1 *; | [A]WO2017205058 (ESSENTIAL DENTAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0013] , [0047] , [0056] - [0058] - [0069]; example 1 *; | [Y]JP2018002570 (SOFSERA CORP) [Y] 6,8 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 32] - [0036] - [0 43] , [0 87] , [0 88]; example 1 *; | [Y]US2018078465 (CHEN LIANG [US], et al) [Y] 4,8-10 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021]; example 1; table 1 *; | [A]CN105267046B (UNIV ZHEJIANG) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0024] - [0025]; example 1 *; | [A]CN108324578B (UNIV WUHAN) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0004] - [0014]; example 1 *; | [Y] - QI YIPIN ET AL, "Effects of Molecular Weight and Concentration of Poly(Acrylic Acid) on Biomimetic Mineralization of Collagen", ACS BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE & ENGINEERING, US, vol. 4, no. 8, doi:10.1021/acsbiomaterials.8b00512, ISSN 2373-9878, (20180813), pages 2758 - 2766, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/acsbiomaterials.8b00512, XP055798103 [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [02.2] , [ 3.1]; figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsbiomaterials.8b00512 | by applicant | WO2020035321 | - FERRACANE et al., "Academy of Dental Materials guidance—Resin composites: Part II-Technique sensitivity (handling, polymerization, dimensional changes", Dental Materials, (20170000), vol. 33, doi:10.1016/j.dental.2017.08.188, pages 1171 - 1191, XP085215389 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dental.2017.08.188 | - CAS, no. 10043-52-4 |