EP4011765 - A ROTARY WING AIRCRAFT WITH AN ASYMMETRICAL REAR SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS HELICOPTERS DEUTSCHLAND GmbH Industriestraße 4 86609 Donauwörth / DE | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFALLER, Rupert 85521 Riemerling / DE | 02 /
RIES, Tobias 86695 Nordendorf / DE | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | GPI Brevets 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury Bât B2 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20400024.4 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4011765 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4011765 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/04, B64C27/82, B64C1/00, B64C23/06, B64C39/00, B64C39/04 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
B64C27/04 (EP);
B64C27/82 (EP,US);
B64C1/0009 (EP,US);
B64C27/06 (US);
B64C39/029 (EP,US);
B64C2027/8218 (EP);
B64C2027/8236 (EP,US);
B64C2027/8254 (EP);
B64C2027/8272 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/24] | B64C27/04, B64C27/82, B64C23/06, B64C39/00, B64C39/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2022/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DREHFLÜGELFLUGZEUG MIT ASYMMETRISCHEM HECKTEIL | [2022/24] | English: | A ROTARY WING AIRCRAFT WITH AN ASYMMETRICAL REAR SECTION | [2022/24] | French: | AÉRONEF À AILE TOURNANTE AVEC UNE SECTION ARRIÈRE ASYMÉTRIQUE | [2022/24] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 23.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5108044 (WEINER STEVEN D [US], et al); | [A]JPH0733091 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [XYI]US2003106958 (GOLD PHILLIP JEREMY [US], et al); | [XYI]EP2687442 (BELL HELICOPTER TEXTRON INC [US]); | [XYI]EP2808253 (AIRBUS HELICOPTERS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]); | [XYI]EP2957502 (BELL HELICOPTER TEXTRON INC [US]); | [XY]WO2020079649 (SADA JAIME GUILLERMO [US], et al) | by applicant | US2452355 | US3241791 | US4928907 | US5209430 | EP1395489 | RU2282565 | FR2897040 | EP2511177 | WO2014176431 | EP3317180 |