EP4019742 - A SEALING ASSEMBLY FOR A VANE SET OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPRISING SUCH A SEALING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANSALDO ENERGIA S.p.A. Via Nicola Lorenzi 8 16152 Genova / IT | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bavassano, Francesco 16152 Genova / IT | 02 /
Tappani, Marco 16152 Genova / IT | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Corso Magenta, 56 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Eccetto, Mauro, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 20425060.9 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019742 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/06, F01D11/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
F01D9/065 (EP);
F01D11/00 (CN);
F01D11/001 (EP);
F01D25/12 (CN);
F01D9/041 (CN);
F05D2230/51 (EP);
F05D2260/205 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN SCHAUFELSATZ EINES GASTURBINENMOTORS UND GASTURBINENMOTOR MIT EINER SOLCHEN DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG | [2022/26] | English: | A SEALING ASSEMBLY FOR A VANE SET OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPRISING SUCH A SEALING ASSEMBLY | [2022/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR UN JEU D'AUBES D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ET MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ COMPRENANT UN TEL ENSEMBLE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 29.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2023 | 31.12.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1026003 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 *; | [X]US6082961 (ANDERSON GORDON [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,15,16 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 23; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2015104695 (ANSALDO ENERGIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,16 * page 5, line 29 - page 7, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]EP3168426 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,16* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0025]; figures 2,4 *; | [A]US2019211698 (KIM DONG HWA [KR]) [A] 1,16 * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0122]; figure 3 *; | [XDAI]EP3663522 (ANSALDO ENERGIA SPA [IT]) [XD] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0076]; figures 3-4 * [A] 11-14 [I] 3-6,8-10,15,16 | by applicant | EP3663522 |