EP3855049 - PRESSURE SENSOR ASSEMBLY AND SEALING ELEMENT FOR A PRESSURE SENSOR ASSEMBLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Locovei, Cosmin Ion c/o Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property - Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Goron, Gabriel c/o Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property - Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Jejeran, Cosmin c/o Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property - Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
Pascu, Daniel-Adrian c/o Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH IntellectualProperty - Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 05 /
Glaser, Telmo c/o Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property - Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive GmbH Intellectual Property Nordostpark 30 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Continental Corporation c/o Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20465501.3 | 23.01.2020 | [2021/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855049 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/04, F16J15/06, F16J15/10, G01L19/14 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
F16J15/064 (EP);
G01L19/0672 (EP,US);
F16J15/106 (EP);
G01L19/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTELEMENT FÜR EINE DRUCKSENSORBAUGRUPPE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND DRUCKSENSORBAUGRUPPE | [2021/30] | English: | PRESSURE SENSOR ASSEMBLY AND SEALING ELEMENT FOR A PRESSURE SENSOR ASSEMBLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2021/30] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR UN MODULE DE CAPTEUR DE PRESSION POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET MODULE DE CAPTEUR DE PRESSION | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 08.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE4447513 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12,13,15 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 20; figures 1-3 * [I] 3-7,11,14; | [X]JPH1164145 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2013335919 (SHINODA TAKUYA [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2018283970 (OSAWA TOMOKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,13 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figures 4,7 * [I] 3,5-7,11,12,14 |