EP3911692 - POLYETHYLENE FILM FOR HEAT SEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARG, Priya P/O SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 02 /
SOLIMAN, Maria c/o SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
GARG, Priya 6160 GA Geleen / NL | ||
02 /
SOLIMAN, Maria 6160 GA Geleen / NL | Representative(s) | Sabic Intellectual Property Group Sabic Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20700297.3 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020EP50681 | Priority number, date | EP20190152323 | 17.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19152323 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148229 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911692 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B32B27/32, C08F210/16 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
B32B27/06 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/02 (US);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/327 (EP,KR);
C08F110/02 (US);
C08F2/04 (KR);
C08F2/06 (US);
C08F210/14 (KR);
C08F210/16 (KR,US);
B29K2023/06 (US);
B29L2031/712 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/542 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (EP,KR);
C08F2500/12 (US);
C08F2500/37 (US);
C08F2500/39 (US);
C08J2323/06 (US);
C08J2323/08 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | POLYETHYLENFOLIE ZUM HEISSSIEGELN | [2021/47] | English: | POLYETHYLENE FILM FOR HEAT SEALING | [2021/47] | French: | FILM DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE POUR LE THERMOSCELLAGE | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6162871 (WATANABE HIDEO [JP], et al); | [A]US2007117946 (SCHWAB THOMAS J [US], et al); | [I]WO2018113455 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL], et al); | [A]US2018201705 (DESPORTES SERGE [FR], et al); | [XP]WO2019207172 (SABIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP [NL]); | [E]WO2020064349 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) |