EP3911866 - HIGH PRECISION GEAR BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ, Ingo Berliner Strasse 22 97447 Gerolzhofen / DE | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
SCHULZ, Ingo 97447 Gerolzhofen / DE | Representative(s) | Kohl, Thomas SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20700787.3 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020EP50639 | Priority number, date | DE201910200645 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019200645 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148200 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911866 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3911866 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/66 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
F16C33/6648 (EP,CN,US);
F16H57/0471 (CN);
F16C2202/50 (CN);
F16C2322/39 (CN);
F16C2322/59 (EP,CN);
F16C2361/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHPREZISIONSGETRIEBE | [2023/44] | English: | HIGH PRECISION GEAR BOX | [2021/47] | French: | BOITE DE VITESSE DE PRECISION | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/47] | HOCHPRÄZISIONSGETRIEBE | ||
Former [2021/47] | BOÎTE DE VITESSES DE HAUTE PRÉCISION | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 12.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0164968 (DRESSER IND [US]); | [A]DE102014104599 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE], et al); | [Y]DE102016211690 (SKF AB [SE]) | Examination | JP2004360738 | EP1832766 | EP3350477 |