EP3914842 - VENTILATION CAP ON A SOLENOID VALVE IN COMPRESSED-AIR INSTALLATIONS, FOR EXAMPLE FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Europe BV Chaussée de la Hulpe 166 1170 Brussels / BE | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEGER, Marco Marie-Juchacz-Weg 1 30855 Langenhagen / DE | 02 /
ALBRECHT, Johannes Adolf-Homeyer-Weg 17 30938 Burgwedel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
SEEGER, Marco 30855 Langenhagen / DE | ||
02 /
ALBRECHT, Johannes 30938 Burgwedel / DE | Representative(s) | Ohlendorf, Henrike ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20700799.8 | 14.01.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020EP50747 | Priority number, date | DE201910101556 | 23.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019101556 | [2021/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020151990 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3914842 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, B60T17/00, F01N1/08, F15B21/00, F16K47/08 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
F16K31/0627 (EP,US);
B60T17/008 (EP,US);
F16K47/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | ENTLÜFTUNGSKAPPE AN EINEM MAGNETVENTIL IN DRUCKLUFTANLAGEN, BEISPIELSWEISE FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2021/48] | English: | VENTILATION CAP ON A SOLENOID VALVE IN COMPRESSED-AIR INSTALLATIONS, FOR EXAMPLE FOR VEHICLES | [2021/48] | French: | CAPUCHON DE PURGE D'AIR SUR UNE ÉLECTROVANNE DANS DES SYSTÈMES D'AIR COMPRIMÉ, PAR EXEMPLE POUR DES VÉHICULES | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 23.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/33] | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2022/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE102013013281 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-11 * paragraph [0002]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 4; | [X]US6089346 (TREDINNICK KENNETH F [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]CN201487360U (LI YAOFENG) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XI]US4417717 (MOELLER RUDOLF [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * figures 1-6 * [I] 10,11; | [XI]DE4237630 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * [I] 10,11; | [X]EP0708007 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,11 * abstract *; | [A]US6622819 (REYNOLDS STEVEN M [US]) [A] 1-6 * figure 4 * | by applicant | DE102009029968 |