EP3914672 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYETHYLENES FROM WASTE PLASTIC FEEDSTOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN ZIJL, Anthoni P.O Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 02 /
GOYHENEIX, Nicolas C/o Sabic Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 03 /
GALAN-SANCHEZ, Lara C/o Sabic Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 04 /
ROOSEN, Christoph P.O Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 05 /
PASTWA, Johan P.O Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 06 /
FARAJZADEH BIBALAN, Safa P.O Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
VAN ZIJL, Anthoni 6160 GA Geleen / NL | ||
02 /
GOYHENEIX, Nicolas 6160 GA Geleen / NL | |||
03 /
GALAN-SANCHEZ, Lara 6160 GA Geleen / NL | |||
04 /
ROOSEN, Christoph 6160 GA Geleen / NL | |||
05 /
PASTWA, Johan 6160 GA Geleen / NL | |||
06 /
FARAJZADEH BIBALAN, Safa 6160 GA Geleen / NL | Representative(s) | Sabic Intellectual Property Group Sabic Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/48] | Sabic Intellectual Property Group Sabic Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 20701074.5 | 24.01.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020EP51729 | Priority number, date | EP20190153458 | 24.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19153458 | EP20190153897 | 28.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19153897 | EP20190157324 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19157324 | EP20190157064 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19157064 | EP20190157898 | 19.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19157898 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020152319 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3914672 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3914672 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C10G57/02, C10G69/12 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
C10G1/002 (EP);
C10G57/02 (EP,US);
B29B17/02 (US);
B29B17/04 (US);
B29C48/277 (US);
C08J11/00 (US);
C08J11/06 (US);
C08J11/12 (US);
C08J11/14 (US);
C08L23/06 (US);
C10G1/10 (EP,US);
C10G47/00 (US);
C10G50/00 (EP,US);
C10G51/023 (US);
C10G69/12 (US);
C10G9/14 (US);
C10G9/36 (EP);
B29B2017/0089 (US);
B29B2017/0203 (US);
B29B2017/0496 (US);
C08J2300/30 (US);
C08L2207/20 (US);
C10G2300/1003 (US);
C10G2300/1085 (US);
C10G2300/1096 (US);
C10G2300/201 (US);
C10G2400/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHYLENEN AUS KUNSTSTOFFABFALLAUSGANGSMATERIALIEN | [2021/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYETHYLENES FROM WASTE PLASTIC FEEDSTOCKS | [2021/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE POLYÉTHYLÈNES À PARTIR DE DÉCHETS DE MATIÈRES PREMIÈRES EN PLASTIQUE | [2024/31] |
Former [2021/48] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE POLYÉTHYLÈNES À PARTIR DE MATIÈRES PREMIÈRES DE DÉCHETS PLASTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 23.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2021 | Observations by third parties | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5981818 (PURVIS DAVID [CA], et al); | [XI]WO2016142809 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]); | [XI]WO2018025104 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]); | [XI]WO2018055555 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) | Examination | US5364995 | US5639937 |