EP3915163 - METHOD AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR SETTING AN OPERATING STRATEGY FOR A FUEL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Sergei Boecklerstr. 41 70199 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
BRAUN, Jochen Birkenstr. 10 71296 Heimsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
HAHN, Sergei 70199 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
BRAUN, Jochen 71296 Heimsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 20701274.1 | 15.01.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020EP50899 | Priority number, date | DE201910200949 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019200949 | [2021/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020152006 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915163 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04313, H01M8/04992, H01M16/00 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
H01M8/04313 (EP);
H01M8/04925 (US);
B60L50/75 (EP);
B60L58/30 (EP,US);
B60W10/28 (EP);
H01M16/006 (EP);
H01M8/04089 (EP);
H01M8/04201 (EP);
H01M8/043 (EP,US);
H01M8/04365 (EP);
H01M8/04574 (US);
H01M8/04626 (EP);
H01M8/04955 (EP);
H01M8/04992 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM EINSTELLEN EINER BETRIEBSSTRATEGIE FÜR EIN BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM | [2021/48] | English: | METHOD AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR SETTING AN OPERATING STRATEGY FOR A FUEL CELL SYSTEM | [2021/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT DE CIRCUIT DESTINÉS À RÉGLER UNE STRATÉGIE DE FONCTIONNEMENT POUR UN SYSTÈME DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 25.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102013104324 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * claims 1-3, 9 ** paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] *; | [XA]DE102017207477 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,13-15 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0045]; claims 1-15 * [A] 4-6 |