EP3911354 - AAV-MEDIATED GENE THERAPY RESTORING THE OTOFERLIN GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Pasteur 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states Institut Pasteur 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM) 101 rue Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAFIEDDINE, Saaid 75012 Paris / FR | 02 /
PETIT, Christine 75012 Paris / FR | [2023/29] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
SAFIEDDINE, Saaid 75724 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR | ||
02 /
PETIT, Christine 75724 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20701951.4 | 20.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020EP51283 | Priority number, date | EP20190305071 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19305071 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148458 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911354 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3911354 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3911354 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K48/00, C07K14/00, C12N15/86, A61P27/16 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
A61K38/16 (EP,IL);
C12N15/86 (IL,KR,US);
A61K38/177 (IL,US);
A01K67/0275 (EP,IL);
A01K67/0276 (EP,IL);
A61K38/1709 (IL,KR);
A61K48/00 (IL,KR);
A61K48/005 (EP,IL);
A61P27/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,IL,KR);
A01K2217/056 (EP,IL);
A01K2217/075 (EP,IL);
A01K2217/20 (EP,IL);
A01K2227/105 (EP,IL);
A01K2267/0306 (EP,IL);
C12N2750/14132 (IL,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2750/14144 (EP,IL);
C12N2750/14171 (IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | A61K38/16, A61K48/00, A61P27/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AAV-VERMITTELTE GENTHERAPIE ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DES OTOFERLIN-GENS | [2021/47] | English: | AAV-MEDIATED GENE THERAPY RESTORING THE OTOFERLIN GENE | [2021/47] | French: | THÉRAPIE GÉNIQUE MÉDIÉE PAR AAV RESTAURANT LE GÈNE OTOFERLINE | [2023/05] |
Former [2021/47] | THÉRAPIE GÉNIQUE MÉDIÉE PAR VECTEUR AAV RESTAURANT LE GÈNE DE L'OTOFERLINE | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 28.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.02.2024 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | EP23184106.5 / EP4295913 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.2024
22.04.2024
ADMISSIBLE Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown NY 10591 / US Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 02
18.04.2024
19.04.2024
ADMISSIBLE Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB P.O. Box 860 820 81635 München / DE | 03
19.04.2024
22.04.2024
ADMISSIBLE Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 04
19.04.2024
22.04.2024
ADMISSIBLE Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.2024
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown NY 10591 / US Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
02
18.04.2024
Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB P.O. Box 860 820 81635 München / DE | 03.05.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.09.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US6967018 | WO2011075838 | US8137962 | US8298818 | WO2013075008 | Opposition | WO2018039375 | WO2018204734 | WO2014193716 | WO2017100791 | WO2019165292 | WO2021087296 |