EP3914127 - GUIDE DEVICE AND GUIDE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schock Metallwerk GmbH Siemensstrasse 1-3 73660 Urbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states Schock Metallwerk GmbH Siemensstrasse 1-3 73660 Urbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMERMANN, Joachim Astrid-Lindgren-Weg 4/1 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
ZIMMERMANN, Joachim 73614 Schorndorf / DE | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 20702109.8 | 24.01.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020EP51798 | Priority number, date | DE201910200980 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019200980 | [2021/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020152346 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3914127 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/473, A47C1/03, B60N2/75 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
A47B88/473 (EP,US);
B60N2/773 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FÜHRUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/48] | English: | GUIDE DEVICE AND GUIDE SYSTEM | [2021/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE ET SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 15.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1502521 (ACCURIDE INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-11,14-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0044]; figure - * [A] 7,8,12,13; | [XA]WO2007017688 (ACCURIDE INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,14-16 * page 1, line 1 - page 10, line 29; figure - *[A] 12,13; | [XA]DE102014220049 (SCHOCK METALLWERK [DE]) [X] 1-5,9-11,14-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0157]; figure - * [A] 6-8,12,13 |