EP3921304 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF METHIONINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILZ, Jürgen Lessingstr. 11 63579 Freigericht / DE | 02 /
BORGMANN, Cornelia Römischer Ring 48 60486 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
FISCHER, Achim Schwendelgasse 35 63773 Goldbach / DE | 04 /
GEIST, Lucas Am Weiherborn 9 63579 Freigericht / DE | 05 /
NORDSCHILD, Anja Falkenweg 12 61440 Oberursel / DE | 06 /
RENNER, Christian Am Ziegelacker 12 63584 Gründau / DE | 07 /
REUS, Christian St.-Hubertus-Weg 6 63579 Freigericht / DE | 08 /
RONNEBURG, Axel Kirschbaumallee 11 63457 Hanau / DE | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
BILZ, Jürgen 63579 Freigericht / DE | ||
02 /
BORGMANN, Cornelia 60486 Frankfurt / DE | |||
03 /
FISCHER, Achim 63773 Goldbach / DE | |||
04 /
GEIST, Lucas 63579 Freigericht / DE | |||
05 /
NORDSCHILD, Anja 61440 Oberursel / DE | |||
06 /
RENNER, Christian 63584 Gründau / DE | |||
07 /
REUS, Christian 63579 Freigericht / DE | |||
08 /
RONNEBURG, Axel 63457 Hanau / DE | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20702136.1 | 03.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020EP52603 | Priority number, date | EP20190155305 | 04.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19155305 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020161067 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921304 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3921304 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/58, C07C319/20 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
C07C319/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/20, C07C323/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | C07C319/20, C07C323/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHIONIN | [2021/50] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF METHIONINE | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MÉTHIONINE | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 21.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP3199519 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018021338 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | US2019161434 [ ] (AOKI TAKANORI [JP], et al) [ ] * example 5 * | by applicant | JPS5446717 | JPH0393757 | US6417395 | EP1506940 | US2012215021 | EP3199519 | WO2018021338 | US2019161434 |