EP3921271 - REDUCED-PRESSURE FILLING NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SERAC Group Route de Mamers 72400 La Ferte Bernard / FR | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAFFIN, André Jean-Jacques 1N 424 Indian Knoll Road West Chicago, Illinois 60185 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
GRAFFIN, André Jean-Jacques Chicago, Illinois 60185 / US | Representative(s) | Cabinet Boettcher, et al 5, rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20702665.9 | 06.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020EP53048 | Priority number, date | FR20190001296 | 08.02.2019 Original published format: FR 1901296 | [2021/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020161266 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921271 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/26 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
B67C3/2608 (EP,US);
B67D7/005 (US);
B67D7/36 (US);
F16K1/38 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | FÜLLSTUTZEN MIT VERMINDERTEM DRUCK | [2021/50] | English: | REDUCED-PRESSURE FILLING NOZZLE | [2021/50] | French: | BEC DE REMPLISSAGE A DEPRESSION | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 15.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 14.03.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011154220 (WEIGHTPACK S P A [IT], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 2 *; | [A]WO2018007412 (SERAC GROUP [FR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]DE2246176 (FT ABFUELLSYSTEME GMBH) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph last - page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO2013091750 (KHS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |