EP3911516 - MULTILAYER MEMBRANE FOR CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tema Technologies and Materials Srl Via dell'Industria, 21 31029 Vittorio Veneto (TV) / IT | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSATTA, Nicola Via Asiago, 14B 31015 Conegliano (TV) / IT | 02 /
CAIS, Federico Via De Gasperi, 30/1 31020 San Vendemiano (TV) / IT | 03 /
BORTOLIN, Katia Via Belvedere, 10 31020 Refrontolo (TV) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
BUSATTA, Nicola 31015 Conegliano (TV) / IT | ||
02 /
CAIS, Federico 31020 San Vendemiano (TV) / IT | |||
03 /
BORTOLIN, Katia 31020 Refrontolo (TV) / IT | Representative(s) | Frare, Paolo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20702914.1 | 15.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020IB50289 | Priority number, date | IT20190000819 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: IT201900000819 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148662 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911516 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/32, E01D19/08, E04B1/66, B32B7/02, B32B7/12, B32B27/30, B32B27/34, B32B27/36 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
E02D31/008 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B7/02 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
E02D31/02 (EP,US);
E02D31/025 (US);
B32B2250/24 (US);
B32B2307/30 (EP);
B32B2307/7242 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (US);
B32B2419/00 (EP,US);
E02D2300/0009 (US);
E02D2300/001 (US);
E02D2300/0015 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE MEMBRAN FÜR BAUZWECKE | [2021/47] | English: | MULTILAYER MEMBRANE FOR CONSTRUCTION | [2021/47] | French: | MEMBRANE MULTICOUCHE DESTINÉE À LA CONSTRUCTION | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 14.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0723570 (GRACE W R & CO [US]); | [XDI]GB2340070 (FOSROC INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]); | [XI]US2006051558 (SIEBER MARCO [CH], et al) |