EP3938208 - COOLANT HOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Techno-Chemie GmbH Dieselstraße 4 61184 Karben / DE | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDT, Alexandra c/o Continental AG Intellectual Property - Jädekamp 30 30419 Hannover / DE | 02 /
SONT, Michael c/o Continental AG Intellectual Property - Jädekamp 30 30419 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
BRANDT, Alexandra 30419 Hannover / DE | ||
02 /
SONT, Michael 30419 Hannover / DE | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental AG Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20702977.8 | 27.01.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020EP51843 | Priority number, date | DE201910203254 | 11.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019203254 | [2022/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020182360 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938208 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/30, B32B5/02, B32B25/08, B32B25/10, B32B25/14, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, F16L11/08 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
F16L11/085 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/10 (EP,US);
B32B25/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B5/02 (EP);
B32B5/026 (EP,US);
F16L11/082 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0223 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0284 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP,US);
B32B2597/00 (EP,US);
F16L2011/047 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | KÄLTEMITTELSCHLAUCH | [2022/03] | English: | COOLANT HOSE | [2022/03] | French: | TUYAU POUR FLUIDE FRIGORIGÈNE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 11.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2009197856 ; | [A]DE102006024568 (HUHTAMAKI FORCHHEIM [DE]) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0038] - [0048] *; | [A]US2009123683 (MILLER LANCE D [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0018] - [0030] *; | [A]DE102010037211 (CONTITECH KUEHNER GMBH & CIE KG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0 28] - [0041] *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 59, Database accession no. 2009-N13114, XP002798053 & JP2009197856 A 20090903 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | US2004118469 |