EP3912122 - PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM AS A FUNCTION OF AN INTENSITY, PREFERABLY OF AN INTERACTION INTENSITY OR TIME INTENSITY, AND COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD DIRECTED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clickle GmbH Kaistraße 90 24114 Kiel / DE | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKOPNIK, Michael Tiroler Ring 416 24147 Kiel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
SKOPNIK, Michael 24147 Kiel / DE | Representative(s) | Puschmann Borchert Kaiser Klettner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20703134.5 | 14.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020DE100020 | Priority number, date | DE20191000201 | 15.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019000201 | DE20192000168U | 15.01.2019 Original published format: DE 202019000168 U | [2021/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020147891 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912122 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q10/06 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0201 (EP);
G06Q10/0637 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABLAUFREGELUNGSSYSTEM ALS FUNKTION EINER INTENSITÄT, BEVORZUGT EINER INTERAKTIONSINTENSITÄT ODER ZEITINTENSITÄT UND EIN JEWEILIGES DARAUF GERICHTETES COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTES VERFAHREN | [2021/47] | English: | PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM AS A FUNCTION OF AN INTENSITY, PREFERABLY OF AN INTERACTION INTENSITY OR TIME INTENSITY, AND COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD DIRECTED THERETO | [2021/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION DE DÉROULEMENT EN TANT QUE FONCTION D'UNE INTENSITÉ, DE MANIÈRE PRÉFÉRÉE D'UNE INTENSITÉ D'INTERACTION OU D'INTENSITÉ DE TEMPS, ET PROCÉDÉ RESPECTIF MIS EN OEUVRE PAR ORDINATEUR S'Y CONFORMANT | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 13.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |