EP3908685 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR METHANE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Twelve Benefit Corporation 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/46] | For all designated states Opus 12 Incorporated 614 Bancroft Way, Suite B Berkeley, CA 94704-2224 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNEGNAW, Sara 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 02 /
KASHI, Ajay R. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 03 /
KUHL, Kendra P. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | 04 /
GEORGE, Morgan 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 05 /
MA, Sichao 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | 06 /
HUO, Ziyang 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 07 /
CAVE, Etosha R. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 08 /
HUA, Kenneth X. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
HUNEGNAW, Sara Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | ||
02 /
KASHI, Ajay R. Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | |||
03 /
KUHL, Kendra P. Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | |||
04 /
GEORGE, Morgan Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | |||
05 /
MA, Sichao Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | |||
06 /
HUO, Ziyang Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | |||
07 /
CAVE, Etosha R. Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | |||
08 /
HUA, Kenneth X. Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | Representative(s) | Higgs, Jonathan Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | Higgs, Jonathan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20703613.8 | 07.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020US12600 | Priority number, date | US201962789371P | 07.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962789371 P | US201962864122P | 20.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962864122 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146402 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908685 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/00, C25B1/06, C25B3/04, C25B9/06, C25B9/10, C25B9/20, C25B11/04 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
C25B1/00 (EP);
C25B9/23 (EP,KR,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,KR);
C25B11/00 (EP);
C25B11/057 (EP);
C25B11/075 (US);
C25B11/089 (KR);
C25B11/091 (KR,US);
C25B13/08 (KR,US);
C25B3/25 (EP,US);
C25B3/26 (KR);
C25B9/19 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR METHANPRODUKTION | [2021/46] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR METHANE PRODUCTION | [2021/46] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MÉTHANE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 29.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2013089112 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11,20,22 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [YDA]US2017321334 (KUHL KENDRA P [US], et al) [YD] 14-16 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 43] , [0 46] , [0 51] , [0 53] , [0 54]; figure 1; table 2 * [A] 17-19; | [XAYI]US2018265440 (KUDO YUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13,20,22,23 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1, 2; example 1; claims 1-10 * * paragraphs [0044] , [0 52] , [0 55] * [A] 17-19,21 [Y] 1,4,14-16 [I] 5-9; | [Y]DE102017208610 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033]; figures 9, 10, 12 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056]; table 1 * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0127]; claims 1-5 * * paragraph [0007] *; | [A] - ENDRODI B ET AL, "Continuous-flow electroreduction of carbon dioxide", PROGRESS IN ENERGY AND COMBUSTION SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170613), vol. 62, doi:10.1016/J.PECS.2017.05.005, ISSN 0360-1285, pages 133 - 154, XP085135284 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pecs.2017.05.005 | by applicant | US2017321334 | US2019226103 | - PHAN et al., "Role of Capping Agent in Wet Synthesis of Nanoparticles", J. Phys. Chem. A, (20180000), vol. 121, no. 17, pages 3213 - 3219 | - BAKSHI, "How Surfactants Control Crystal Growth of Nanomaterials", Cryst. Growth Des., (20160000), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 1104 - 1133 | - MORSY, "Role of Surfactants in Nanotechnology and Their Applications", Int. J. Curr. Microbiol. App. Sci., (20140000), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 237 - 260, XP055612998 |