EP3918838 - CONDITIONAL MOBILITY TRIGGERING BASED ON BEAM INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA SILVA, Icaro L. J. Bergshamra Allé 175 170 77 Solna / SE | 02 /
RUNE, Johan Terrängvägen 12 181 29 Lidingö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
DA SILVA, Icaro L. J. 170 77 Solna / SE | ||
02 /
RUNE, Johan 181 29 Lidingö / SE | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20704082.5 | 29.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020IB50691 | Priority number, date | US201962798563P | 30.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962798563 P | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020157670 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918838 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04B7/06 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
H04W36/0058 (EP,US);
H04W36/30 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W36/302 (EP);
H04W36/0094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | BEDINGTE MOBILITÄTSAUSLÖSUNG BASIEREND AUF STRAHLINFORMATIONEN | [2021/49] | English: | CONDITIONAL MOBILITY TRIGGERING BASED ON BEAM INFORMATION | [2021/49] | French: | DÉCLENCHEMENT DE MOBILITÉ CONDITIONNELLE SUR LA BASE D'INFORMATIONS DE FAISCEAU | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 23.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018175891 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]) [A] 1-33* paragraphs [0170] , [0182] , [0196] *; | [XY]WO2018203716 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,27-33 * paragraphs [0043] , [0045] , [0058] , [0066] , [0067] , [0154] , [0155] , [0157] * [Y] 5-26; | [A]US2018359790 (INGALE MANGESH ABHIMANYU [IN], et al) [A] 1-33 * paragraphs [0044] , [ 0057] , [ 0070] , [ 0072] *; | [Y] - SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS, "Discussion on tendency of cell reselection to cells with more beams", vol. RAN WG2, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180809), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1811404 DISCUSSION ON TENDENCY OF CELL RESELECTION TO CELLS WITH MORE BEAMS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPH, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F103/Docs/R2%2D1811404%2Ezip, (20180809), XP051521060 [Y] 5-26 * Sections 1 and 2 * | [A] - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, "Conditional Reconfiguration for NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171008), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1710669 (R15 NR WI AI 10210 CONDITIONAL RECONFIGURATION), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20171008), XP051342699 [A] 1-33 * Section 1.1 * |