EP3909389 - PACKET BASED LINK AGGREGATION ARCHITECTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
PATIL, Abhishek Pramod 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
VENKATACHALAM JAYARAMAN, Venkata Ramanan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
ASTERJADHI, Alfred 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
CHERIAN, George 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
ZHOU, Yan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
PATIL, Abhishek Pramod San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
VENKATACHALAM JAYARAMAN, Venkata Ramanan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
ASTERJADHI, Alfred San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
CHERIAN, George San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20704641.8 | 07.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020US12599 | Priority number, date | US201916246410 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: US201916246410 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146401 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909389 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/15 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
H04W76/15 (EP,KR);
H04L5/14 (EP,KR);
H04W28/14 (KR);
H04W76/14 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | PAKETBASIERTE VERBINDUNGSAGGREGATIONSARCHITEKTUREN | [2021/46] | English: | PACKET BASED LINK AGGREGATION ARCHITECTURES | [2021/46] | French: | ARCHITECTURES D'AGRÉGATION DE LIAISONS BASÉE SUR DES PAQUETS | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 17.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010284476 (POTKONJAK MIODRAG [US]) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 32] , [ 103] , [ 105] ** claims 4, 5 *; | [XI]US2013114546 (STANWOOD KENNETH L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,13-17,22,23,25-30 * figures 1, 6 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0 23] , [0 33] , [0 34] , [0 51] , [0 73] , [0 75] , [0 79] , [0 82] , [0 85] , [0 88] * * paragraphs [0098] , [ 101] , [ 105] , [ 109] , [ 110] * [I] 6-9,12,18-21,24 |