EP3908848 - CONFIGURABLE REFERENCE SIGNAL TIME DIFFERENCE MEASUREMENT (RSTD) SEARCH WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
AKKARAKARAN, Sony QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
FISCHER, Sven QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
OPSHAUG, Guttorm Ringstad QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
AKKARAKARAN, Sony San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
FISCHER, Sven San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
OPSHAUG, Guttorm Ringstad San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20704682.2 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020US13237 | Priority number, date | GR20190100022 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: GR 20190100022 | US201962914236P | 11.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962914236 P | US202016739067 | 09.01.2020 Original published format: US202016739067 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146839 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908848 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/10 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
G01S5/10 (EP,US);
G01S1/0428 (EP);
G01S5/0045 (EP);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L27/266 (US);
H04L27/2665 (US);
H04L27/2675 (US);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
G01S13/74 (EP);
G01S13/76 (US);
G01S2205/01 (EP);
G01S5/0036 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | KONFIGURIERBARES SUCHFENSTER FÜR REFERENZSIGNALZEITDIFFERENZMESSUNG (RSTD) | [2021/46] | English: | CONFIGURABLE REFERENCE SIGNAL TIME DIFFERENCE MEASUREMENT (RSTD) SEARCH WINDOW | [2021/46] | French: | FENÊTRE DE RECHERCHE DE DIFFÉRENCE DE TEMPS PAR RAPPORT AU SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE (RSTD) CONFIGURABLE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 11.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 31.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 29.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2010062606 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [A]US2015215884 (HORVAT MICHAEL [DE], et al); |