EP3909355 - RESOURCE RESERVATION TECHNIQUES FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHARADWAJ, Arjun 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Tien Viet 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
BAGHEL, Sudhir Kumar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
GULATI, Kapil 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
WU, Shuanshuan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
BHARADWAJ, Arjun San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
NGUYEN, Tien Viet San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
BAGHEL, Sudhir Kumar San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
GULATI, Kapil San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
WU, Shuanshuan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20704685.5 | 11.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020US13245 | Priority number, date | US201962791696P | 11.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962791696 P | US202016739975 | 10.01.2020 Original published format: US202016739975 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020146847 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3909355 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP);
H04W72/12 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W72/04 (EP);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENRESERVIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONEN | [2021/46] | English: | RESOURCE RESERVATION TECHNIQUES FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2021/46] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE RÉSERVATION DE RESSOURCES POUR COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 09.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2018030541 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [YA]WO2018175553 (INTEL CORP [US], et al); | [P]EP3499921 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); |