EP4100859 - METHOD FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING OF A VEHICULE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Christian Heleneviksvägen 25 431 36 MÖLNDAL / SE | 02 /
NILSSON, Anders Östfjällsvägen 7 421 66 VÄSTRA FRÖLUNDA / SE | 03 /
EKLUND, Linus Fridhemsvägen 9 429 32 KULLAVIK / SE | 04 /
EKBLOM, Leo c/o Volvo Truck Corporation 405 08 GÖTEBORG / SE | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 20705145.9 | 06.02.2020 | [2022/50] | WO2020EP52995 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155933 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100859 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/00, G06Q50/04, G06Q10/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/00, B33Y80/00 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B29C64/386 (US);
B33Y30/00 (EP);
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
G06F30/15 (EP);
B32B2605/00 (EP);
G06F2113/10 (EP);
G06Q10/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DREIDIMENSIONALEN BEDRUCKEN EINES FAHRZEUGBAUTEILS | [2023/35] | English: | METHOD FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING OF A VEHICULE COMPONENT | [2022/50] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR L'IMPRESSION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE D'UN COMPOSANT DE VÉHICULE | [2023/35] |
Former [2022/50] | VERFAHREN ZUM DREIDIMENSIONALEN DRUCKEN EINES FAHRZEUGBAUTEILS | ||
Former [2022/50] | PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE D'UN COMPOSANT DE VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 26.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2016224592 (KYOCERA DOCUMENT SOLUTIONS INC) [A] 1,3,4,10,12* paragraphs [0022] , [0 23] , [0 49] *; | [A]WO2018065159 (SAFRAN AERO BOOSTERS SA [BE]) [A] 1,3,4,12 * paragraphs [0007] , [00 9] , [0 13] , [0 24] *; | [A]US10339728 (OAKES III CHARLES L [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 5, lines 62-65 * * column 6, lines 60-67 * * column 7, lines 15-26, 38-55 * * column 8, lines 6-20, 25-31 * | by applicant | US2015057784 |