EP3912165 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MANAGING MEDICAL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 5 Health Inc. 11 Franklin Street, Unit 402 San Francisco, CA 94102 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIM, Yan Chuan 134B Hillview Ave. 08-06 Singapore 669621 / SG | 02 /
KOH, Dorothea Li Feng 71 Ayer Rajah Crescent 05-07 Singapore 139951 / SG | 03 /
BHUIYAN, Md Ihtimam Hossain Blk 441, 11-419 Choa Chu Kang Ave 4 Singapore 680441 / SG | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
SIM, Yan Chuan Singapore 669621 / SG | ||
02 /
KOH, Dorothea Li Feng Singapore 139951 / SG | |||
03 /
BHUIYAN, Md Ihtimam Hossain Singapore 680441 / SG | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20705552.6 | 14.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020US13541 | Priority number, date | US201962792171P | 14.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962792171 P | US201962886242P | 13.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962886242 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020150260 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912165 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/00, G06F16/332, G06F16/953, G06F21/30, H04L12/58 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G16H70/20 (EP,US);
G06N5/04 (EP,US);
G06F16/3329 (EP);
G06F16/9535 (US);
G06F21/34 (EP);
G06F21/43 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F40/40 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06N5/02 (EP);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
H04L51/02 (EP,US);
H04L51/046 (US);
G06N3/006 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
H04L51/222 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VERWALTUNG VON MEDIZINISCHEN INFORMATIONEN | [2021/47] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MANAGING MEDICAL INFORMATION | [2021/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS MÉDICALES | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 30.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2011044303 (MYTELEHEALTHSOLUTIONS LLC, et al) [X] 29-34,40 * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0295] - paragraph [0298] * * paragraph [0323] - paragraph [0325] * * paragraph [0338] * * paragraph [0357] * * figures 25, 33 * [I] 35-39; | [I]WO2018071579 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [I] 29-40 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0104] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Multi-factor authentication - Wikipedia", (20190110), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Multi-factor_authentication&oldid=877688407, (20200623), XP055708025 [A] 29-40 * the whole document * |