EP3956191 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR EMERGENCY HANDOFF OF AN AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guident Ltd Acre House 11-15 William Road London NW1 3ER / GB | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Clifford M. 11930 N Bayshore Dr, PH 5 Miami, Florida 33181 / US | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Bates, Daniel Joseph Ogive Intellectual Property Ltd 34 Westgate North Cave Brough HU15 2NJ / GB | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20706016.1 | 24.01.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020IB50548 | Priority number, date | US201916386530 | 17.04.2019 Original published format: US201916386530 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020212764 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956191 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60W60/00, B60K28/14, G05D1/00, H04W4/90, G08G1/127 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
H04W4/40 (EP,US);
G08G1/205 (EP,US);
B60K28/14 (EP);
B60W60/0015 (EP);
B60W60/0053 (EP);
B60W60/007 (EP);
G05D1/0022 (US);
G05D1/0055 (EP);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G07C5/008 (US);
G08G1/0112 (US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (US);
B60W2030/082 (EP);
B60W2556/45 (EP);
B60W2756/10 (EP);
G05D1/021 (US);
G05D1/0287 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR NOTFALLÜBERGABE EINES AUTONOMEN FAHRZEUGS | [2022/08] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR EMERGENCY HANDOFF OF AN AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE | [2022/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE TRANSFERT D'URGENCE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009105902 (CHOI HAE OCK [KR], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0020] , [0030] , [0031] *; | [A]US2018102001 (FAUST ALEKSANDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0024] , [0062] - [0068] *; | [XI]EP3401786 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0188] - [0194] * [I] 4,6-10,14,16-20 | by applicant | US8874301 | US9120484 | US9429943 | US9475496 |