EP3930887 - AUTOMATION OF LABORATORY PROCESSES BY MEANS OF A LABORATORY-PROCESS SUPPORT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HTE GmbH The High Throughput Experimentation Company Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEJMEK, Michael Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
WELTER, Peter Carl-Bosch-Straße 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
SCHEMAINDA, Christoph Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
STAEHLER, Martin Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
MUELLER, Andreas Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
DEJMEK, Michael 69123 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02 /
WELTER, Peter 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03 /
SCHEMAINDA, Christoph 69123 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04 /
STAEHLER, Martin 69123 Heidelberg / DE | |||
05 /
MUELLER, Andreas 69123 Heidelberg / DE | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | Schmitz, Alexander Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20706327.2 | 28.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020EP55251 | Priority number, date | EP20190159937 | 28.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19159937 | [2022/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020174080 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930887 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, G01N35/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
B01J19/0006 (EP);
B01J19/004 (EP);
G01N35/0099 (EP);
G01N2035/00326 (EP);
G01N2035/00881 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERUNG VON LABORPROZESSEN DURCH EINE LABORPROZESSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/01] | English: | AUTOMATION OF LABORATORY PROCESSES BY MEANS OF A LABORATORY-PROCESS SUPPORT DEVICE | [2022/01] | French: | AUTOMATISATION DE PROCESSUS DE LABORATOIRE PAR UN DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE À DES PROCESSUS DE LABORATOIRE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 28.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE10122913 (LIEBEL URBAN [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,10-15,18-21 * paragraphs [0029] - [0036]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,6,9[I] 3,17; | [XDYI]EP1546735 (HTE AG THE HIGH THROUGHPUT EXP [DE]) [XD] 1,2,5,7,8,11-16,18-21 * paragraphs [0030] , [0045] , [0049]; claim 1 * [Y] 4,6,9 [I] 3,17; | [XYI]WO2019006391 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11-16,18-21 * page 14, line 29 - page 17, line 30 * [Y] 4,6,9 [I] 3,17; | [XYI] - GENTSCH J, "FLEXIBLE LABORATORY AUTOMATION TO MEET THE CHALLENGE OF THE '90S", LABORATORY AUTOMATION & INFORMATION MANAGEMENT, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19931201), vol. 21, no. 2/03, ISSN 1381-141X, pages 229 - 233, XP000413296 [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11-16,18-21 * the whole document * [Y] 4,6,9 [I] 3,17 | by applicant | EP0915341 | WO0060361 | US2005101022 | EP1546735 | WO2007090665 | WO2013149117 | WO2014079725 |