EP3935249 - SLIDING DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDLI, Paul Lindenweg 2 5453 Remetschwil / CH | 02 /
VONAESCH, Jonas Weinberglistrasse 24 6005 Luzern / CH | [2024/32] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
FRIEDLI, Paul 5453 Remetschwil / CH | ||
02 /
VONAESCH, Jonas 6005 Luzern / CH | Representative(s) | Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2024/32] | Application number, filing date | 20706358.7 | 02.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020EP55411 | Priority number, date | EP20190161711 | 08.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19161711 | [2022/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020182513 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935249 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3935249 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/46, E05D15/56, E05F15/646, E05D15/06, E05D15/10 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
E06B3/4654 (EP,US);
E05D15/56 (EP,US);
E05D15/0604 (EP,US);
E05D15/063 (EP,US);
E05D15/1042 (EP,US);
E05F15/646 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEBETÜRE | [2022/02] | English: | SLIDING DOOR | [2022/02] | French: | PORTE COULISSANTE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 28.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE10163061 (WELTER ADRIEN [DE]); | [XAI]AT507815 (WEITENTHALER JOHANN [AT], et al) | by applicant | DE10163061 |