EP3935658 - CHARGE NEUTRALIZING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet 4 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | For all designated states AGC Inc. Shin Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | For all designated states AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. 11175 Cicero Drive, Suite 400 Alpharetta, 30022-1167 / US | For all designated states AGC Vidros do Brasil Ltda Estrada Municipal Fazenda São Pedro, 500 Jardim Vista Alegre CEP 12523-671 Guaratinguetá São Paulo / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet 4 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | ||
For all designated states AGC Inc. Shin Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | |||
For all designated states AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. 11175 Cicero Drive, Suite 400 Alpharetta, 30022-1167 / US | |||
For all designated states AGC Vidros do Brasil Ltda Estrada Municipal Fazenda São Pedro, 500 Jardim Vista Alegre CEP 12523-671 Guaratinguetá São Paulo / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDES, José Chaussée de Soignies 10A 7070 Le Roeulx / BE | 02 /
NAVET, Benjamine Avenue des Musiciens, 18 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | 03 /
JACQUES, Amory rue Jean-Baptiste Fichefet, 23 5100 Jambes / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
FERNANDES, José 7070 Le Roeulx / BE | ||
02 /
NAVET, Benjamine 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | |||
03 /
JACQUES, Amory 5100 Jambes / BE | Representative(s) | AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre Intellectual Property Department Rue Louis Blériot 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20706508.7 | 25.02.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020EP54842 | Priority number, date | EP20190160472 | 04.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19160472 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020178068 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935658 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/04, H01J37/09, H01J37/30, H01J37/32 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H01J37/04 (EP);
H01J37/09 (EP);
H01J37/30 (EP);
H01J2237/0041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | LADUNGSNEUTRALISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/02] | English: | CHARGE NEUTRALIZING APPARATUS | [2022/02] | French: | APPAREIL DE NEUTRALISATION DE CHARGE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 04.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6309515 (INOUE KEN [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 6A, 6B, 10A, 10B, 10C *; | [A]EP1220272 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US2006272772 (AL-BAYATI AMIR [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0049] - [0052]; figure 3 * [Y] 1-5,7-10; | [Y]EP2287883 (NAWOTEC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] - [0 37] - [0040]; figures 5b,5c *; | [Y]JP4998972B (ULVAC CORP) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 14] , [0 18] , [0 21] , [0 26]; figures 1,5 * | by applicant | JP4998972B |