EP3935373 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRON BACKSCATTER DIFFRACTION SAMPLE CHARACTERISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VG Systems Limited 3rd Floor 1 Ashley Road Altrincham WA14 2DT / GB | For all designated states FEI COMPANY 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, Oregon 97124-5793 / US | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states VG Systems Limited 3rd Floor 1 Ashley Road Altrincham WA14 2DT / GB | ||
For all designated states FEI COMPANY 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, Oregon 97124-5793 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAY, Austin Penrose Aunt Daisy Scientific Ltd. Old Coach House The Cross Clearwell, Gloucestershire GL16 8JT / GB | 02 /
STEPHENS, Christopher James Thermo Fisher Scientific Unit 24, The Birches Imberhorne Lane East Grinstead, Sussex RH19 1UB / GB | 03 /
STEJSKAL, Pavel c/o FEI Company Vlastimila Pecha 1282/12 62700 Brno / CZ | 04 /
PETREK, Martin c/o FEI Company Vlastimila Pecha 1282/12 62700 Brno / CZ | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
DAY, Austin Penrose Clearwell, Gloucestershire GL16 8JT / GB | ||
02 /
STEPHENS, Christopher James East Grinstead, Sussex RH19 1UB / GB | |||
03 /
STEJSKAL, Pavel 62700 Brno / CZ | |||
04 /
PETREK, Martin 62700 Brno / CZ | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20706556.6 | 03.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020EP55588 | Priority number, date | EP20190160632 | 04.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19160632 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020178296 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935373 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3935373 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/20058, G01N23/203 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
G01N23/203 (EP,US);
G01N2223/0566 (EP,US);
G01N2223/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINER PROBE MITTELS ELEKTRONENRÜCKSTREUUNGSDIFFRAKTION | [2023/20] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRON BACKSCATTER DIFFRACTION SAMPLE CHARACTERISATION | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE CARACTÉRISATION D'ÉCHANTILLONS PAR DIFFRACTION D'ÉLECTRONS À RÉTRODIFFUSION | [2023/20] |
Former [2022/02] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINER ELEKTRONENRÜCKSTREUUNGSDIFFRAKTIONSPROBE | ||
Former [2022/02] | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE CARACTÉRISATION D'ÉCHANTILLON DE DIFFRACTION D'ÉLECTRONS RÉTRODIFFUSÉS | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 15.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2016123907 (LI LILI [CN], et al); | by applicant | US2016054240 |