EP3924576 - AUTOMATED PARKING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parkstory GmbH Maria-Theresia-Straße 29 81675 München / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2021/51] | For all designated states Nussbaum, Hans Pappelweg 2 77694 Kehl-Sundheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUSSBAUM, Hans 77694 Kehl-Sundheim / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2021/51] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 20706656.4 | 14.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020EP53984 | Priority number, date | DE201910103933 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: DE102019103933 | [2021/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020165446 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3924576 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3924576 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/22, E04H6/34, E04H6/42 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
E04H6/22 (EP);
E04H6/34 (EP);
E04H6/422 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES PARKSYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2021/51] | English: | AUTOMATED PARKING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES | [2021/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STATIONNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE POUR VÉHICULES | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 02.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO2006038069 (FRUSSO RICARDO DANIEL [AR], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7 [Y] 8-11; | [XAYI]WO2006054124 (BREZOVITS LASZLO [HU]) [X] 1-5,12 * pages 1-6; figures 1-6 * [A] 7 [Y] 8-11 [I] 6; | [YA]WO2010074128 (IHI TRANSPORT MACHINERY CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 8-11 * the whole document *[A] 1-7,12 | by applicant | US2005207876 | US2007098528 | DE102014112269 | EP3094796 |